COLLEGE OF ST BARNABAS

Charity number: 205220
Charity reporting is up to date (199 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The College of St. Barnabas was established in 1895 to provide retirement homes for Anglican Clergy, Church Workers, Readers licensed by a Bishop and their wives and widows. In 2005 those in communion with Church of England are included. There is also a care wing for those requiring care and medical support. The full objectives of the Charity can be found in the Memorandum of Association.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 May 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • THE HOME OF ST BARNABAS INC (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev David Michael Williams Chair 12 April 2021
None on record
Sally Martin Trustee 20 May 2024
THE FRIENDS OF THE COLLEGIATE CHURCH OF ST PETER AND ST PAUL, LINGFIELD
Received: On time
LINGFIELD UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF THE COLLEGE OF ST BARNABAS
Received: On time
LINGFIELD UNITED TRUST
Received: On time
Alexandra Durrant Trustee 20 May 2024
SACKVILLE COLLEGE
Received: On time
Ruth Alicia Martin Trustee 11 May 2023
None on record
Rev Ian Peter Whitley Trustee 24 April 2022
None on record
Dr Ursula Mary Hodges Trustee 10 May 2021
None on record
Rev David Ivorson Trustee 12 April 2021
None on record
Rev Wendy Jane Edwards Trustee 12 April 2021
None on record
Dr Eileen Margaret Phillips Trustee 10 June 2019
None on record
Richard Edwin Peter Diggory Trustee 03 June 2017
None on record
Peter Lawrence Beynon Trustee 16 May 2017
None on record
The Venerable Moira Anne Elizabeth Astin Trustee 09 October 2016
THE ECCLESIASTICAL LAW SOCIETY
Received: On time
REGINALD BAKER CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE SOUTH LONDON CHURCH FUND AND SOUTHWARK DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £1.97m £2.15m £2.16m £1.89m £2.14m
Total expenditure £2.02m £2.18m £2.21m £2.34m £2.20m
Income from government contracts £108.00k £101.66k £237.88k £242.16k £317.54k
Income from government grants N/A £31.74k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £304.00k £431.00k £393.00k £274.00k £407.04k
Income - Other trading activities £16.00k £16.00k £10.00k £19.00k £61.51k
Income - Charitable activities £1.63m £1.68m £1.73m £1.58m £1.66m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £24.00k £19.00k £29.00k £14.00k £10.79k
Income - Other £0 £6.00k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £1.00k £4.64k £57.30k £35.00k £53.66k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.89m £2.06m £2.10m £2.15m £2.12m
Expenditure - Raising funds £125.00k £120.00k £108.00k £185.00k £82.94k
Expenditure - Governance £277.00k £0 £7.00k £7.00k £8.19k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £10.00k £8.00k £10.00k £9.00k £4.05k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Own use assets £2.50m £2.45m £2.39m £2.34m £2.27m
Long-term investments £653.00k £650.00k £709.00k £348.00k £240.35k
Other assets £237.00k £312.00k £251.00k £97.00k £190.06k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £233.00k £283.00k £202.00k £169.00k £159.50k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 15 January 2025 199 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 15 January 2025 199 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 29 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 29 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 03 November 2022 126 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 03 November 2022 126 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 28 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 25 August 2020 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 25 August 2020 56 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
BLACKBERRY LANE
LINGFIELD
SURREY
RH7 6NJ
Phone:
01342870260