THE SHOTTESBROOKE AND WHITE WALTHAM WELFARE CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To help residents in the area of benefit in relieving conditions of need, hardship or distress.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Reading
- Windsor And Maidenhead
Governance
- 07 March 1967: Standard registration
- UNITED CHARITIES (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rachel Louise Ford | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Robert John Crittendon | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Rev David Atallah | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|||||
Katherine Ann White | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sally Elizabeth Gray | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|||||
Nicola McCann | Trustee | 01 September 2011 |
|
|||||
LOUIS ALBERT KUNZIG IV | Trustee |
|
||||||
Dr CHRISTOPHER M WREN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.58k | £3.41k | £3.70k | £5.18k | £5.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £302 | £1.48k | £607 | £2.42k | £1.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 1 APRIL 1992
Charitable objects
RELIEVING,EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY,PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED,HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS,SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED,HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS
Area of benefit
SHOTTESBROOKE,WHITE WALTHAM AND THE WARD OF SOUTH HURLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
SPIRE VIEW
WALTHAM ROAD
WHITE WALTHAM
MAIDENHEAD
SL6 3SG
- Phone:
- 07834545967
- Email:
- carolynt52@icloud.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window