TAUNTON AND DISTRICT MENCAP SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TM exists (A) for the relief of people with a learning disability in particular by the provision of help and support for them and their families, dependants and carers, and (B) To provide or assist in the provision of facilities for the recreation or other leisure time occupation for people who have need thereof by reason of learning disability with the object of improving their conditionsof life
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
Total income includes £4,689 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Somerset
Governance
- 16 April 1962: Standard registration
- TAUNTON MENCAP LOCAL SOCIETY (Working name)
- TAUNTON AND DISTRICT SOCIETY FOR MENTALLY HANDICAPPED CHILDREN (Previous name)
- TAUNTON AND DISTRICT SOCIETY FOR MENTALLY HANDICAPPED CHILDREN AND ADULTS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charles Farrand | Chair | 02 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Estelle Dawe | Trustee | 05 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Cathryn Nash | Trustee | 22 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roger Stephen Nash | Trustee | 22 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Sedgbeer | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lee Millward | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Anne Goss | Trustee | 25 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Moira Jane Cunningham Brown | Trustee | 27 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Brooks-Daw | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.75k | £12.35k | £29.19k | £26.51k | £18.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.82k | £19.04k | £23.81k | £24.68k | £24.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.69k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 21 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 04 December 2023 | 127 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 04 December 2023 | 127 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 19 September 2022 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 13 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED FEBRUARY 1957 AS AMENDED FEBRUARY 1963, 20TH FEBRUARY 1965 AND 5TH DECEMBER 2002 as amended on 04 Sep 2024
Charitable objects
A) The relief of people with a Learning Disability in particular by the provision of help and support for them and for their families, dependants and carers, and B) To provide or assist in the provision of facilities for the recreation or other leisure time occupation for people who have need thereof by reason of Learning Disability with the object of improving their conditions of life.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BUT IN PRACTICE TAUNTON AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
81 Eaton Crescent
Taunton
TA2 7UE
- Phone:
- 01823252718
- Email:
- dbrooksdaw@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window