BISHOPS LYDEARD CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of accomodation for elderly people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Somerset
Governance
- 25 April 1962: Standard registration
- BISHOPS LYDEARD ALMSHOUSE CHARITY (Working name)
- ALMSHOUSE CHARITY (Previous name)
- THE ALMSHOUSE CHARITY (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR M C HANSFORD | Chair | |||||||
Jane Warmington | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carole Balston | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Louise Foster | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sue Cahalin | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Peacocke | Trustee | 15 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Smeaton | Trustee | 12 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
ABIGALE CLARE COOK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN CAMPBELL LACY DAY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EDWARD GEORGE FERRIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.80k | £39.75k | £39.57k | £41.63k | £48.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.87k | £22.79k | £23.14k | £30.57k | £48.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME SEALED 28TH FEBRUARY 1990
Charitable objects
MAINTENANCE OF CHARITY PROPERTY INCLUDING ALMSHOUSES FOR ALMSPEOPLE WHO SHALL BE POOR PERSONS OF GOOD CHARECTER OF NOT LESS THAN 60 YEARS OF AGE WHO ( ECEPT IN SPECIAL CASES TO BE APPROVED BY THE COMMISIONERS ) ARE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITH A PREFERANCE FOR SUCH PERSONS WHO ARE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF THE ANCIENT PARISH OF BISHOPS LYDEARD.
Area of benefit
BISHOPS LYDEARD
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Farriers Green
Monkton Heathfield
TAUNTON
Somerset
TA2 8PR
- Phone:
- 07588571775
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window