ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS NORTH SOMERSET BRANCH

Charity number: 205284
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We work for the benefit of all animals, by trying to prevent cruelty and by providing new homes for the many animals which come into our care. We help all animals-large or small.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Animals
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • North Somerset
  • Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 October 1969: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • RSPCA NORTH SOMERSET BRANCH (Working name)
  • RSPCA NORTH SOMERSET BRANCH (Previous name)
  • RSPCA SOMERSET NORTH AND SOUTH AVON BRANCH (Previous name)
  • RSPCA SOMERSET NORTH BRANCH - WESTON-SUPER-MARE DIVISION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Susan Francis Badger Trustee 14 July 2023
None on record
Maxine Rachel Gosden Trustee 14 July 2023
None on record
Joseph James Tristram Trustee 19 January 2023
THE HELEN NEATBY MEMORIAL FUND
Received: On time
CARL EVANS Trustee
EMMANUEL CHURCH WSM
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £681.89k £652.69k £473.42k £900.50k £544.33k
Total expenditure £644.88k £558.89k £457.18k £681.33k £689.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £188.54k £105.80k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £206.09k £443.74k N/A £280.39k £166.62k
Income - Other trading activities £462.11k £190.01k N/A £350.96k £353.45k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 N/A £251.16k £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.71k £916 N/A £405 £5.71k
Income - Other £11.98k £18.03k N/A £17.58k £18.55k
Income - Legacies £86.19k £51.73k N/A £174.87k £32.83k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £348.86k £313.31k N/A £425.65k £460.10k
Expenditure - Raising funds £296.02k £245.58k N/A £255.68k £229.69k
Expenditure - Governance £31.01k £12.69k N/A £50.40k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 N/A £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £2.39m £2.38m N/A £1.63m £1.63m
Long-term investments £32.01k £24.88k N/A £257.56k £272.30k
Other assets £330.06k £431.26k N/A £824.22k £684.72k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Total liabilities £33.81k £25.29k N/A £22.75k £26.54k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 03 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 03 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 26 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 26 September 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 24 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 24 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 21 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
RSPCA
Rescue Centre
Brent Road
Brent Knoll
HIGHBRIDGE
Somerset
Phone:
01278 782671