STOKE POGES UNITED CHARITY

Charity Number: 205289
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Relief of persons resident in the area of benefit, being the ancient parish of Stoke Poges and the surrounding area, who are in need, hardship or distress.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £11,412
Total expenditure: £7,424

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Buckinghamshire
  • Slough

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 May 1962: Standard registration
  • 30 April 2003: Removed (Funds transferred (s.74))
  • 30 April 2003: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • STOKE POGES UNITED CHARITIES (Previous name)
  • UNITED CHARITIES (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
TREVOR FRANK EGLETON Chair 22 July 2017
None on record
Rev Natasha Brady Trustee 29 January 2019
None on record
MR MICHAEL DIER Trustee 29 May 2017
None on record
DR SUSAN M LYNCH Trustee 29 May 2017
None on record
DR CHRIS MORRIS Trustee 28 March 2017
None on record
Tracey Clark Trustee 22 March 2017
None on record
Christine Taylor Trustee 15 December 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £10.65k £10.86k £10.86k £11.37k £11.41k
Total expenditure £15.71k £7.42k £7.42k £11.07k £7.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 17 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 25 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEMES OF 21 FEBRUARY 1888 AND 4 MAY 1906 AND SECTION 74 RESOLUTION OF 22ND JULY 2002
Charitable objects
APPRENTICING A POOR OF THE PARISH - PROVISION OF TOOLS OR OUTFITS FOR SUCH BOYS UPON ENTERING ANY TRADE, OCCUPATION OR SERVICE.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF STOKE POGES
Registration history
  • 07 May 1962 : Standard registration
  • 30 April 2003 : Removed
  • 30 April 2003 : Asset transfer out

Contact information

Address:
Kidd Rapinet Llp
392 Edinburgh Avenue
SLOUGH
SL1 4UF
Phone:
01753 532541