Financial history WYNDHAM COTTLE ALMSHOUSES

Charity Number: 205293
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £17.64k £18.09k £18.26k £18.26k £5.03k
Total expenditure £22.88k £8.89k £7.14k £7.66k £68.87k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A