WORCESTER CONSOLIDATED MUNICIPAL CHARITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
(i) provision of sheltered housing in Worcester City; (ii) provision of financial relief for cases of need, hardship or distress in Worcester City; (iii) provision of financial assistance to organisations that give services calculated to reduce need, hardship or distress of their beneficiaries; and (iv) payment of pensions to needy Worcester residents (none are paid owing to State provision).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2016
Total income:
£574,592
Donations and legacies | £72 | |
Charitable activities | £210.38k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £317.50k | |
Other | £46.65k |
Total expenditure:
£15,062,596
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £15.05m | |
Other | £0 |
£4,341 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £64,152 from government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £17.24k | |
Charitable expenditure | £15.05m |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Worcestershire
Governance
- WORCESTER MUNICIPAL CHARITIES (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 30/06/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £904.97k | £986.44k | £1.72m | £1.08m | £574.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £739.82k | £840.03k | £917.70k | £1.14m | £15.06m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £7.64k | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £135.36k | £64.15k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £100.57k | £786.71k | £0 | £72 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £193.14k | £209.97k | £272.51k | £429.23k | £210.38k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £610.87k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £711.83k | £675.90k | £663.97k | £655.27k | £317.50k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £46.65k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £626.49k | £725.65k | £868.82k | £1.00m | £15.05m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £17.24k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £54.86k | £44.26k | £17.30k | £43.60k | £21.56k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £248.45k | £219.53k | £309.27k | £338.05k | £236.15k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £58.48k | £70.12k | £31.58k | £43.05k | £17.24k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £50.00k | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 30/06/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £1.83m | £1.85m | £1.93m | £4.07m | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £11.60m | £11.61m | £12.37m | £9.15m | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £784.29k | £1.04m | £1.05m | £1.41m | £0 | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £67.77k | £119.04k | £144.67k | £140.79k | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2016 | 31 May 2017 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2016 | 31 May 2017 | 31 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 12 September 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | 07 September 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 22 April 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | 26 March 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 09 June 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | 30 May 2014 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 30/12/1977 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 18/05/1988 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 29/08/2002 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 30/10/2002 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 24/02/2010 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 29/02/2012 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 28/05/2014
Charitable objects
1) PROVISION OF ALMSHOUSES FOR POOR PERSONS WHO HAVE RESIDED IN THE CITY OF WORCESTER FOR NOT LESS THAN 5 YEARS. 2) PROVISION OF PENSIONS FOR POOR PERSONS WHO HAVE RESIDED IN THE CITY OF WORCESTER FOR NOT LESS THAN 5 YEARS. 3) TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE CITY OF WORCESTER WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
CITY OF WORCESTER.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window