JOSEPH CHARIOTT'S CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our objective is providing accommodation in Windsor at subsidised rates to persons in conditions of need, hardship and distress, with a preference for such persons who are adherents of the United Reformed Church.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Windsor And Maidenhead
Governance
- 14 May 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Homes England
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Douglas Seguin | Chair | 01 January 2000 |
|
|||||
Colin Lundie Shearer | Trustee | 19 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Gail Sherwood | Trustee | 19 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Frank Alfred John Tarrant | Trustee | 11 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY MUNDYE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.18k | £22.79k | £23.02k | £24.02k | £25.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.10k | £13.44k | £35.20k | £9.79k | £8.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 17TH NOVEMBER 1981
Charitable objects
1. PROVISION OF ALMSHOUSES FOR PERSONS IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS WHO ARE INHABITANTS OF WINDSOR WITH A PREFERENCE FOR SUCH PERSONS WHO ARE ADHERENTS OF THE UNITED REFORMED CHURCH. 2. MAINTENANCE OF ALMSHOUSES BELONGING TO THE CHARITY. 3. BENEFIT OF ALMSPEOPLE.
Area of benefit
WINDSOR
Contact information
- Address:
-
233 ST. LEONARDS ROAD
WINDSOR
SL4 3DR
- Phone:
- 01753852874
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
none.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window