DAVID WILLIAMSON'S PENSIONS FUND
Charity Number: 205328
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
No information available
Who the charity helps:
No information available
How the charity helps:
No information available
Governance
Registration history:
- 17 September 1968: Standard registration
- 17 July 2000: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 17 July 2000: Funds transferred to 1145202-1 HENRY SMITH'S OR THE POYLE CHARITY
Organisation type:
Other names:
- GUILDFORD MUNICIPAL CHARITIES (Working name)
- GUILDFORD RELIEF IN NEED CHARITIES (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods
Accounts and annual returns
No accounts and annual returns information is available for this removed charity
Governing document
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 26TH APRIL 1902 AND SCHEMES OF THE 28TH MAY 1907 AND 6TH JUNE 1968 AND 28TH FEBRUARY 1986.
Charitable objects
RELIEF OF POVERTY IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
BOROUGH OF GUILDFORD AS BEFORE 1/4/74,PART OF AP OF MERROW.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.