MALVERN MENCAP SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of people with a learning disability - in particular by the provision of help and support for them and their families, dependents and carers, and to educate the public regarding learning disabilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 02 April 1962: Standard registration
- MALVERN SOCIETY FOR MENTALLY HANDICAPPED CHILDREN AND ADULTS - KNOWN AS MALVERN MANCAP SOCIETY (Previous name)
- MALVERN SOCIETY FOR MENTALLY HANDICAPPED CHILDREN AND ADULTS - KNOWN AS MALVERN MENCAP SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roseanne Box | Trustee | 27 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Rowan | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Parker | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Bevan | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Bowker | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Branwen O'Brien | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Burton | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Judy Gudegeon | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Geraldine Stevens | Trustee | 03 August 2016 |
|
|||||
PETER JAMES SANTRY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR KEN INSTAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.79k | £13.17k | £14.10k | £12.36k | £12.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.50k | £14.81k | £15.04k | £12.83k | £12.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 March 2023 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1985 AS AMENDED 3 MARCH 1987 AS AMENDED 5 NOVEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
A. THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE WITH A LEARNING DISABILITY IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF HELP AND SUPPORT FOR THEM AND FOR THEIR FAMILIES, DEPENDANTS AND CARERS, AND TO PREVENT LEARNING DISABILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; AND B. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISIONS OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR PEOPLE WHO HAVE NEED THEREOF BY REASON OF LEARNING DISABILITY WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE "LEARNING DISABILITY" MEANS ANY DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITY OF THE MIND AND ANY ASSOCIATION CONDITION HOWSOEVER CAUSED AND WHETHER MILD, MODERATE OR SEVERE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
MALVERN MENCAP SOCIETY
at 2nd Malvern Scout HQ
Spring Lane
Malvern
Worcs
WR141AL
- Phone:
- 01684577699
- Email:
- peter_santry@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window