Governing document CHARITY OF THOMAS PURNELL GULLY
Charity number: 205483

Charity reporting is up to date (166 days late)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED AT BRISTOL ON 9TH FEBRUARY 1892, SCHEMES OF THE 1ST JANUARY 1897, 7TH AUGUST 1946, 29TH MARCH 1967 AND 5TH JULY 1971
Charitable objects
THREE COTTAGES FOR THE RENT FREE OCCUPATION OF THREE WIDOWS OR WIDOWERS OR MARRIED COUPLES OF NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
LONGWELL GREEN
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.