EASTON UNITED CHARITIES

Charity Number: 205516
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To help the poor and needy in the parish of Easton. The charity is long established and the main assets are land donated in the past.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £5,342
Total expenditure: £3,251

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambridgeshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 December 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kathy Angela Yates Trustee 30 October 2023
None on record
PHILLIP JAMES BELL Trustee 30 October 2023
None on record
Katie Sarah Turner Trustee 30 October 2023
None on record
Brian Arbuthnott Trustee 24 January 2023
None on record
Helen Mayer Trustee 14 January 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £5.09k £4.63k £5.06k £5.30k £5.34k
Total expenditure £6.23k £7.36k £4.90k £2.93k £3.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 28 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 12 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 03 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 09 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 24 JULY 1972
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF EASTON WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF EASTON
Registration history
  • 06 December 1963 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
2 Broadweir
The Lane
Easton
HUNTINGDON
Cambridgeshire
PE28 0UB
Phone:
07776082933
Website:

No information available