Charity overview BAND FUND

Charity number: 246412-4
Removed charity
Governing document
SCHEME OF 8 MAY 1959 AS VARIED BY ORDER OF 24 NOVEMBER 1964 AND SCHEMES OF 27 APRIL 1965 AND 14 MAY 1970
Charitable objects
FOR EQUIVALENT PURPOSES IN RESPECT OF THE ESSEX REGIMENT, TERRITORIAL AND ARMY VOLUNTEER RESERVE, THE ROYAL ANGLIAN REGIMENT AND ANY UNIT OR SUB-UNIT OF THE TERRITORIAL AND ARMY VOLUNTEER RESERVE ASSOCIATED WITH THE FORMER THE ESSEX REGIMENT ( TERROTORIAL)OR WITH THE FORMER 4TH/5TH BATTALION THE ESSEX REGIMENT (TERRITORIAL ARMY). PROVIDED THAT IF AND IN SO FAR AS THE INCOME OF ANY YEAR IS NOT REQUIRED FOR THE PURPOSES AFORESAID THE MANAGING TRUSTEES MAY APPLY OF CAUSE TO BE APPLIED THE SAME:- (I) IN ASSISTING PERSONS HAVING SERVED IN THE ESSEX REGIMENT (AND ESPECIALLY IN THE FORMER 3RD (MILITIA) BATTALION THEREOF) AND THEIR DEPENDENTS BEING IN NEED OF ASSISTANCE AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT IN ANY WAY LIMITING THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) MAY FOR THAT PURPOSE MAKE GRANTS TO THE CHARITY NUMBERED 6 ABOVE AND CALLED THE ESSEX MILITIA AID FUND; (II) IN PAYING SUBSCRIPTIONS OR MAKING DONATIONS TO HOSPITALS, HOMES OR INSTITUTIONS HAVING AMONGST THEIR OBJECTS THE SUCCOUR IN SICKNESS OR CONVALESCENT OF OFFICERS OR MEN WHO ARE SERVING OR HAVE SERVED IN HER MAJESTY'S FORCES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 19 January 1966: Standard registration
  • 19 February 2002: Removed (Transferred to exempt chy)
Other names

No other names