THE FOUNDATION OF ST AUGUSTINE READING (ELEANOR PALMER TRUST)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide financial and other support to the Anglican Chaplain appointed to, but not employed by, the University of Reading.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Reading
Governance
- 21 June 1962: Standard registration
- ST AUGUSTINE'S FOUNDATION (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
The Rt. Revd Olivia Graham | Trustee | 07 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Ann Mary Abernethy | Trustee | 07 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter James Moll | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
DR LISA METHVEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.64k | £4.31k | £4.45k | £5.23k | £4.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.80k | £2.42k | £4.43k | £3.70k | £2.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 24 July 2024 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 05 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 21 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 31ST OCTOBER 1925
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A HOUSE AND STIPEND FOR A CHAPLAIN FOR READING UNIVERSITY.
Area of benefit
READING
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chaplaincy Centre
Park House Lodge
University Of Reading
PO Box 217
READING
RG6 6AH
- Phone:
- 01183786774
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window