BRITISH HERPETOLOGICAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Conservation, Research, Captive Breeding, Education within Herpetology
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

18 Trustee(s)
22 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Madagascar
- Portugal
- Spain
- United States
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK HOLLOWELL | Chair | 22 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Shea | Trustee | 07 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Marcio Pie | Trustee | 07 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Richard John Hodges | Trustee | 23 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Gerardo Garcia | Trustee | 23 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jonathan Bielby | Trustee | 23 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN COPLEY | Trustee | 21 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
SUZANNE SIMPSON | Trustee | 21 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
MR JIM LABISKO | Trustee | 21 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
STEVEN ALLAIN | Trustee | 21 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Paul Eversfield | Trustee | 29 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Mr A von Plettenberg Laing | Trustee | 29 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr CHRISTOPHER GLEED-OWEN | Trustee | 20 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
KIM ELIZABETH LE BREUILLY | Trustee | 19 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr SIMON TOWNSON | Trustee | 13 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL HENRY WISE | Trustee | 13 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
JANICE VERETTE CLEMONS | Trustee | 13 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
TREVOR ANDREW ROSE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.48k | £67.95k | £93.15k | £46.76k | £32.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.35k | £49.62k | £31.42k | £28.84k | £43.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 November 2024 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 14 November 2024 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 June 2024 | 231 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 December 2022 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 December 2022 | 45 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 March 2022 | 124 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 04 March 2022 | 124 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES AS AMENDED 1956 AND 31 MARCH 2007
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF THE STUDY AND PROTECTION OF AMPHIBIANS AND REPTILES IN PARTICULAR THROUGH SCIENTIFIC RESEARCH, CAPTIVE BREEDING AND HUSBANDRY, CONSERVATION AND FIELDWORK AND EDUCATION
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O ZOOLOGICAL SOCIETY OF LONDON
REGENTS PARK
LONDON
NW1 4RY
- Phone:
- 07778830192
- Email:
- secretary@thebhs.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window