MARSWORTH SOCIAL CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide a social centre for the general benefit of the residents of the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £2,348 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Buckinghamshire
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 25 May 1962: Standard registration
- MARSWORTH MILLENNIUM HALL (Working name)
- MARSWORTH VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOSEPHINE ELIZABETH KEMPSTER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
John Kelly | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Deana Nicola Kelly | Trustee | 12 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
LYNDA ROSEMARY BRAKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD DOUGLAS BRAKE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.74k | £15.10k | £19.24k | £15.79k | £20.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.85k | £9.82k | £13.32k | £21.31k | £17.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £8.01k | £9.48k | N/A | £2.35k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE AND TRUST DEED DATED 20TH APRIL 1961 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION 12 MARCH 1999
Charitable objects
SOCIAL CENTRE FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS AND INHABITANTS OF THE VILLAGE OF MARSWORTH, IN THE FURTHERANCE OF SOCIAL, RECREATIONAL AND EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
MARSWORTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Lukes Lane
Gubblecote
Tring
Herts
HP23 4QQ
- Phone:
- 01296 660773
- Email:
- kellymuckaway@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window