DORMANSLAND WAR MEMORIAL HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are Trustees for a community and grounds in the heart of Dormansland. We provide facilities and events for all the members of the parish, their friends and family. We are proud to be the Trustees for a Hall for All.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £21,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 17 July 1962: Standard registration
- 21 November 1995: Removed
- DORMANSLAND MEMORIAL CLUB 1987 (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Lindsey Bell | Chair | 16 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicola O'Riordan | Trustee | 16 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Herbert Nichols | Trustee | 16 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Comber | Trustee | 16 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Birchall | Trustee | 16 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Morris | Trustee | 16 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip Davy | Trustee | 16 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £4.11k | £8.51k | £34.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £2.62k | £5.47k | £27.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £21.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 December 2024 | 43 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 January 2022 | 87 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED 1 JUNE 1920 SUPPLEMENTED BY DEED OF 4 FEBRUARY 1929, 7 MARCH 1929, 2 SEPTEMBER 1938 AND 23 FEBRUARY 1954.
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A MENS CLUB AND SOCIAL CENTRE FOR THE VILLAGE.
Area of benefit
DORMANSLAND
Linked charities
- 17 July 1962 : Standard registration
- 21 November 1995 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
Dormansland Community Memorial Hall
2 Plough Road
Dormansland
Lingfield
Surrey
RH7 6PS
- Phone:
- 01342834521
- Email:
- davidbirchall99@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window