Accounts and annual returns MARINERS LODGE NO 249 BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 205772
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2007 17 December 2008 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2006 17 December 2008 413 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2004 05 April 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 Not Required