THE TRANS-ANTARCTIC ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 205773
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Grants for research and development activities and presentation and publication of associated scientific reports relating to the Antarctic region of the earth.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £13,678
Total expenditure: £15,031

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England
  • New Zealand

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 May 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr JOHN RICHARD SHEARS Chair 26 April 2016
FUCHS FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Dr Vanessa Clare Bowman Trustee 13 May 2019
None on record
Dr James Smith Trustee 11 April 2012
None on record
PROF A CLARKE Trustee
NORFOLK WILDLIFE TRUST
Received: On time
FUCHS FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Dr JULIAN GERALD PAREN Trustee
BRITISH ANTARCTIC MONUMENT TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £13.95k £13.52k £12.64k £12.53k £13.68k
Total expenditure £13.68k £10.83k £9.36k £7.81k £15.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 09 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 02 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 24 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 09 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
PETERS ELWORTHY & MOORE
SALISBURY HOUSE
2-3 SALISBURY VILLAS
CAMBRIDGE
CB1 2LA
Phone:
01223728222