THE SILVERSMITHS AND JEWELLERS CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support members of the Silversmiths & Jewellery industry, past and present, who have fallen on hard times.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
- 02 April 1996: Removed
- THE GOLDSMITHS', SILVERSMITHS' AND JEWELLERS' BENEVOLENT SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTONY CHARLES VANDERPUMP | Chair | 21 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Paul Marshall | Trustee | 25 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Clare Erica Buckle | Trustee | 28 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jason Francis Williams | Trustee | 02 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Barrie Stephen Dobson | Trustee | 02 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Melanie Ngaere Edness Eddy | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ben Poulsom | Trustee | 07 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Honor Gregory | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gary Stephen Williams | Trustee | 02 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
IAN THOMSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN MICHAEL BOWLES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VICTORIA ELIZABETH COX | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR G G MACDONALD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ZOE CAROLINE HILL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £172.95k | £170.09k | £105.86k | £139.99k | £178.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £232.82k | £262.90k | £236.08k | £223.05k | £245.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 APRIL 1953 AS AMENDED NOVEMBER 1966 AND 12TH AUGUST 2004 as amended on 07 Oct 2021 as amended on 22 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
The objects for which the Charity is established are: 2.1 The relief of beneficiaries in need by reason of ill-health, disability or financial hardship. 2.2 The relief of poverty of beneficiaries. For the purposes of this Article, ‘beneficiaries’ shall mean individuals who are employed or engaged or who were formerly employed or engaged in the goldsmiths, jewellery or silversmiths business or have supplied skills or commodities to these trades or have been employed primarily in the sale of items produced by these trades and the dependants of such individuals. It is generally required that the individual should have been so engaged or employed for a minimum of 7 years, but this shall be at the discretion of the Trustees.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Linked charities
- 22 September 1962 : Standard registration
- 02 April 1996 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO BOX 61660
LONDON
SE9 9AN
- Phone:
- 07861 124238
- Email:
- info@thesjcharity.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window