SMALLWOOD TRUST

Charity number: 205798
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Smallwood Trust's mission is to enable women to be financially resilient. Our funding is allocated under three main programmes: 1) grants to women-led and women focused third sector organisations 2) grants and support to individuals in need and 3) funding to amplify policy issues and solutions to gender poverty

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 September 1962: Standard registration
  • 29 October 2019: Removed (Amalgamated)
  • 29 October 2019: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • GRANTS FOR WOMEN IN NEED (Working name)
  • MISS SMALLWOOD'S SOCIETY (Working name)
  • SALRC (Working name)
  • SMALLWOODTRUST (Working name)
  • SOCIETY FOR THE ASSISTANCE OF LADIES IN REDUCED CIRCUMSTANCES (Working name)
  • SOCIETY FOR THE ASSISTANCE OF LADIES IN REDUCED CIRCUMSTANCES (ALSO KNOWN AS MISS SMALLWOOD'S SOCIETY) (Previous name)
  • THE SMALLWOOD TRUST (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Smallwood Trust (Trustee) Limited Trustee 01 November 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.44m £3.73m £2.09m £1.26m £2.07m
Total expenditure £1.95m £5.14m £4.19m £3.06m £3.87m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £70.00k £2.10m £825.22k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £189.69k £2.79m £1.12m £320.77k £1.23m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.25m £942.80k £963.67k £939.35k £838.67k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £38.69k £22.49k £14.77k £111.17k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.84m £5.03m £4.08m £2.94m £3.78m
Expenditure - Raising funds £108.96k £106.60k £109.46k £125.50k £89.47k
Expenditure - Governance £55.21k £81.46k £75.00k £22.78k £31.32k
Expenditure - Grants institution £677.45k £3.79m £2.81m £1.74m £2.76m
Expenditure - Investment management £108.96k £106.60k £109.46k £125.50k £88.94k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £180.52k £728.13k £7.01k £4.97k £16.36k
Long-term investments £35.31m £33.62m £35.13m £29.06m £28.18m
Other assets £1.42m £1.42m £1.22m £1.22m £1.92m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £298.74k £1.29m £1.08m £734.03k £1.39m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 08 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 08 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 26 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 26 September 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 27 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 22 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 10 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 10 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME DATED 29 OCT 2019
Charitable objects
PAYMENT OF A PENSION TO A LADY IN REDUCED CIRCUMSTANCES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 22 September 1962 : Standard registration
  • 29 October 2019 : Removed
  • 29 October 2019 : Asset transfer out

Contact information

Address:
Smallwood Trust
25 Hornyold Road
MALVERN
WR14 1QQ
Phone:
01684574645