THE BEAUMONT CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
An Almshouse Charity
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 25 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 11 January 1966: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RAYMOND J KERR | Chair | 05 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
HUGH COLIN WILSON | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Helen Ann Bryan | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Graham Holmes | Trustee | 24 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
EDWARD WILLIAM HERBERT CLARK | Trustee |
|
||||||
LYNN PHILLIPS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 25/03/2020 | 25/03/2021 | 25/03/2022 | 25/03/2023 | 25/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £186.69k | £180.71k | £196.30k | £234.33k | £263.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £257.09k | £245.19k | £363.93k | £236.82k | £268.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 25 March 2024 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 March 2024 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 25 March 2023 | 04 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 March 2023 | 04 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 25 March 2022 | 05 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 March 2022 | 05 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 25 March 2021 | 30 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 March 2021 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 25 March 2020 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 March 2020 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 19 APRIL 2004. as amended on 13 Feb 2024
Charitable objects
"BENEFICIARIES" MEANS PERSONS IN NEED OF NOT LESS THAN 60 YEARS OF AGE WHO ARE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT. "RESIDENTS" MEANS THOSE BENEFICIARIES OF THE CHARITY WHO LIVE IN THE HOMES. "THE HOMES" MEANS THE ALMSHOUSES OF THE CHARITY. (1) THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: (A) THE PROVISION OF HOUSING ACCOMMODATION FOR BENEFICIARIES; AND (B) SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS AS THE TRUSTEES DECIDE. (2) THE TRUSTEES MAY ALSO MAKE SUCH CHARITABLE DONATIONS AS THEY THINK APPROPRIATE TO: (A) DURING SUCH TIMES AS THEY ARE PREACHED, THE FOLLOWING SERMONS (I) THE VICAR OF THE PARISH OF CHESHUNT FOR PREACHING OR CAUSING TO BE PREACHED A SERMON ON OR NEAR THE 11 JUNE IN EACH YEAR. (II) THE VICAR OR SEXTON PRESENT ON THE OCCASION OF THE PREACHING OF THE ABOVE-MENTIONED SERMON. (III) THE SAID VICAR FOR PREACHING OR CAUSING TO BE PREACHED IN THE PARISH CHURCH OF CHESHUNT A SERMON DURING LENT IN EACH YEAR; AND (B) THE REPAIR AND REPAINTING OF THE TOMB OF FRANCES LEESON IN CHESHUNT PARISH CHURCH.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF CHESHUNT IN THE COUNTY OF HERTFORDSHIRE.
Linked charities
- 11 January 1966 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 Landmead Road
Cheshunt
WALTHAM CROSS
EN8 9HP
- Phone:
- 07952144899
- Email:
- linda.russell28@ntlworld.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window