Charity overview WILLIAM SUTTON TRUST
Charity number: 205847
Removed charity
Activities - how the charity spends its money
On 1st April 2004 the Trust transferred all its assets and liabilities to William Sutton Housing Association Limited, now the amalgamated Affinity Sutton Homes from 30 September 2011. The Trust did not carry out any activity in the year ended 31st March 2013 and does not expect to trade in future periods. The Trust was de-registered from the Tenant Services Authority register on 17 September 2010.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2016
Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.