WILLIAM SUTTON TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
On 1st April 2004 the Trust transferred all its assets and liabilities to William Sutton Housing Association Limited, now the amalgamated Affinity Sutton Homes from 30 September 2011. The Trust did not carry out any activity in the year ended 31st March 2013 and does not expect to trade in future periods. The Trust was de-registered from the Tenant Services Authority register on 17 September 2010.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Southwark
Governance
- 13 April 1962: Standard registration
- 06 February 2017: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- WILLIAM SUTTON TRUST (Working name)
- THE SUTTON HOUSING TRUST (Previous name)
- THE WILLIAM SUTTON TRUST (Previous name)
- WILLIAM SUTTON TRUST (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 29 July 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 03 August 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 29 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 13 August 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 15TH MAY 1990, AS AMENDED BY SCHEME SEALED 13 MARCH 1997, AND RESOLUTIONS DATED 9 OCTOBER 1997, 23 JULY 1998 & 28 NOVEMBER 2002.
Charitable objects
RELIEF OF PERSONS WITH LOW INCOME RESIDENT IN ENGLAND, WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED BY THE PROVISION OF HOUSING AND HOSTELS WITH ANCILLARY AMENITIES THERETO UPON SUCH TERMS AS ARE APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS AND THE RELIEF OF POOR PERSONS ACCOMMODATED WITHIN THE CHARITY'S PROPERTY IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window