Trustees ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS BRISTOL AND DISTRICT BRANCH
Charity number: 205858

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Bolt | Trustee | 21 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon Cheetham | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ryan Peek | Trustee | 12 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Fay Farrelly | Trustee | 24 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Galina Staneva | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Clifford Buck Burge | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Linda Harper | Trustee | 24 June 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.