Accounts and annual returns THE DOLE CHARITY

Charity number: 205862
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2006 28 March 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2005 09 March 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2004 31 January 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 31 January 2005 On Time