EGHAM UNITED CHARITY

Charity number: 205885
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Charity's purpose is to relive "persons resident in the area who are in need, hardship or distress by making grants of money or paying for items, services or facilities". The area is the electoral wards of Egham, Englefield Green, Hythe and Virginia Water and a beneficiary should, normally, have resided there for not less than five years.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £28,413
Total expenditure: £21,032

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 September 1990: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • EGHAM UNITED CHARITIES (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ryszard Nowobilski Chair 14 December 2023
EGHAM EDUCATION TRUST
Received: On time
Anthea Elizabeth Mylordos Trustee 15 August 2024
STEWART'S AND BUDGEN'S ALMSHOUSES
Received: On time
EGHAM EDUCATION TRUST
Received: On time
Wendy Mengham Trustee 15 August 2024
STEWART'S AND BUDGEN'S ALMSHOUSES
Received: On time
EGHAM EDUCATION TRUST
Received: On time
Tina Dallman Trustee 07 July 2023
STEWART'S AND BUDGEN'S ALMSHOUSES
Received: On time
EGHAM EDUCATION TRUST
Received: On time
Alison Mary Edgar Trustee 13 April 2022
EGHAM EDUCATION TRUST
Received: On time
STEWART'S AND BUDGEN'S ALMSHOUSES
Received: On time
Susan Lee Trustee 16 May 2019
EGHAM EDUCATION TRUST
Received: On time
STEWART'S AND BUDGEN'S ALMSHOUSES
Received: On time
Richard Banks Trustee 14 September 2018
STEWART'S AND BUDGEN'S ALMSHOUSES
Received: On time
Hemang Shah Trustee 17 May 2018
EGHAM EDUCATION TRUST
Received: On time
STEWART'S AND BUDGEN'S ALMSHOUSES
Received: On time
DIANA MARGARET BRICKELL Trustee 29 June 2011
EGHAM EDUCATION TRUST
Received: On time
STEWART'S AND BUDGEN'S ALMSHOUSES
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £20.97k £22.35k £23.86k £26.24k £28.41k
Total expenditure £8.91k £18.92k £21.94k £19.53k £21.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 15 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 15 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 16 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 16 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 18 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 15 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 12 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Egham United Charity
Gladstone House
77-79 High Street
EGHAM
Surrey
TW20 9HY
Phone:
07434364596