EMILY BRYDGES WILLYAMS MEMORIAL HOUSES

Charity number: 205892
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of 3 self contained flats for elderly people

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 15 August 2023

Total income: £11,515
Total expenditure: £7,107

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Cornwall

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 May 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Homes England
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Paul Young-Jamieson Trustee 30 October 2019
None on record
Claire Elizabeth Mary Young-Jamieson Trustee 30 October 2019
None on record
William Harvey John Corbett Trustee 30 October 2019
None on record
Marian Clare Tyson Trustee 17 January 2018
None on record
Emma Wilton Trustee 20 September 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 15/08/2019 15/08/2020 15/08/2021 15/08/2022 15/08/2023
Total gross income £10.08k £10.08k £10.22k £9.49k £11.52k
Total expenditure £6.63k £4.70k £10.88k £9.13k £7.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 15 August 2023 03 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 15 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 15 August 2022 24 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 15 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 15 August 2021 16 June 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 15 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 15 August 2020 26 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 15 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 15 August 2019 29 September 2020 106 days late
Accounts and TAR 15 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 19 APRIL 1906 AND SCHEME OF 16 AUGUST 1966
Charitable objects
TO MAINTAIN THE ALMSHOUSES AND KEEP THEM IN GOOD REPAIR
Area of benefit
PARISH OF MAWGEAN-IN-PYDAR
Registration history
  • 21 May 1962 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
Carnanton House
Carnanton
NEWQUAY
TR8 4ED
Phone:
01637860345
Website:

No information available