Financial history ONSLOW ALMSHOUSES

Charity number: 205893
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £9.25k £8.69k £5.67k £11.09k £11.16k
Total expenditure £4.64k £5.64k £20.44k £4.52k £7.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A