THE NIGHTINGALE FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Council met three times during the year, 25 candidates were interviewed by telephone and 20 grants were awarded. The value of grants ranged from £350 to £1500.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
- 30 October 2023: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 30 October 2023: Funds transferred to 229229 THE FLORENCE NIGHTINGALE FOUNDATION
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.67k | £28.15k | £21.39k | £27.00k | £19.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.97k | £30.36k | £31.51k | £34.75k | £19.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 12 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 12 April 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20/06/1857 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 21/03/1861 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 24/08/2012 as amended on 02 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
THE TRAINING, SUSTENANCE AND PROTECTION OF NURSES AND HOSPITAL ATTENDANTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window