ACTION FOR BLIND PEOPLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Action for Blind People support blind and partially sighted people in the United Kingdom. This can mean helping them to find or keep a job, deal with housing issues, helping them to go on holiday, providing sports clubs for visually impaired children, and other services for visually impaired children and their families or providing vital information in the heart of communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£5,892,000
Donations and legacies | £5.89m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£5,892,000
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £5.89m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £5.89m |
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
- 07 May 1996: Removed
- LONDON ASSOCIATION FOR THE BLIND (Previous name)
- SURREY ASSOCIATION FOR THE GENERAL WELFARE OF THE BLIND (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANNA MARGARET TYLOR | Trustee | 10 February 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Alice Collins | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|||||||
Amanda Kate Rowland | Trustee | 14 April 2020 |
|
|||||||
Martin Stuart Davidson KCMG | Trustee | 14 April 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.07m | £5.68m | £7.04m | £3.30m | £5.89m | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.07m | £5.68m | £7.04m | £3.30m | £5.89m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £6.07m | £5.68m | £7.04m | £3.30m | £5.89m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £1.64m | £1.63m | £3.32m | £0 | £2.73m | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £7.00k | £8.00k | £7.00k | £10.00k | £5.89m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £7.00k | £8.00k | £7.00k | £10.00k | £10 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £5.89m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £6.07m | £5.67m | £7.03m | £3.29m | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.22m | £1.10m | £1.29m | £1.03m | £3.03m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.22m | £1.10m | £1.29m | £1.03m | £3.03m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07/05/1888 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/08/1910 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/10/1953 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/09/1992 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 14/04/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31/05/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/04/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/09/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/03/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 25/06/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14 APR 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22 FEB 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BETTER EDUCATION, TRAINING, EMPLOYMENT AND WELFARE OF BLIND AND PARTIALLY SIGHTED PEOPLE, AND GENERALLY TO WATCH OVER AND PROTECT THE INTERESTS OF BLIND AND PARTIALLY SIGHTED PEOPLE AND TO PREVENT BLINDNESS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 22 September 1962 : Standard registration
- 07 May 1996 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
RNIB
Grimaldi Building
154A Pentonville Road
London
N1 9JE
- Phone:
- 0303 123 9999
- Email:
- helpline@rnib.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window