HUGH BOSCAWEN'S CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing accommodation for the elderly
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £30,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cornwall
Governance
- 01 May 1962: Standard registration
- HUGH BOSCAWEN CHARITY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BARBARA JOY FLOYD-NORRIS Chair | Chair | 21 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
William Derek Floyd - Norris | Trustee | 21 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Carol Vivienne Oliver | Trustee | 21 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Gwendoline Ellen Booth | Trustee | 21 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rev Ian Livingstone | Trustee | 21 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sarah A Crompton-Brown | Trustee | 21 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rev Douglas Peter Wren | Trustee | 18 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Desmond Mennear | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kevin John Harris | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Ian Andrew Greet | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.00k | £19.00k | £59.00k | £36.16k | £34.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.00k | £13.00k | £31.00k | £12.50k | £92.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £30.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 01 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 15TH DECEMBER 1922 VARIED BY SCHEME OF THE 22ND JANUARY 1964
Charitable objects
ALMSHOUSES FOR POOR PERSONS OF GOOD CHARACTER, OF NOT LESS THAN 50 YEARS OF AGE, WHO HAVE RESIDED IN THE ANCIENT PARISH OF TREGONY FOR NOT LESS THAN TWO YEARS NEXT PRECEDING THE TIME OF THEIR APPOINTMENT. THE NUMBER OF ALMSPEOPLE SHALL NOT EXCEED TEN.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF TREGONEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Trevillick House
Fore Street
Grampound
TRURO
Cornwall
TR2 4RS
- Phone:
- 07785 748844
- Email:
- bobegerton@mac.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window