SAINT PAUL'S COMMUNITY HALL

Charity Number: 205922
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

"ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE IN CONNECTION WITH THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND" IN THE PARISH OF ST PAUL'S KINGSTON HILL.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £44,524
Total expenditure: £23,100

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Kingston Upon Thames

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 June 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gareth Charles Buchner Trustee 11 December 2023
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PAUL, KINGSTON HILL
Received: On time
Rev Adam Geoffrey Rylett Trustee 29 November 2018
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PAUL, KINGSTON HILL
Received: On time
ADRIAN HOWE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £37.03k £40.51k £41.48k £43.39k £44.52k
Total expenditure £7.40k £27.42k £45.97k £63.10k £23.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 15 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 15 May 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 16 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 16 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 17 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 17 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 22 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 22 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 27 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
12 ST. ALBANS ROAD
KINGSTON UPON THAMES
KT2 5HQ
Phone:
07715750041
Website:

No information available