Governing document THE SHEPPARD TRUST
Charity number: 205924
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 11 OCTOBER 1932 AS AMENDED BY SCHEMES OF 15 FEBRUARY 1961, 28 SEPTEMBER 1965, 22 JANUARY 1971 AND 21 DECEMBER 1983.
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE HOUSING ACCOMMODATION AND SUCH ATTENDANCE AS MAY BE NECESSARY FOR LADIES OF GENTLE BIRTH IN REDUCED CIRCUMSTANCES.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.