Financial history RSPCA Worcester and Mid-Worcestershire

Charity number: 205930
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £301.30k £865.61k £436.63k £404.41k £976.76k
Total expenditure £280.27k £264.69k £312.70k £378.99k £423.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £63.13k £49.27k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £690.01k N/A N/A £755.20k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £130.54k N/A N/A £122.36k
Income - Charitable activities N/A £45.02k N/A N/A £88.21k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A £42 N/A N/A £10.98k
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A £110.62k N/A N/A £516.08k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £191.33k N/A N/A £342.49k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £73.36k N/A N/A £81.37k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A £0