ALL SAINTS AND DISTRICT VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
This charity maintains a building for community activities ranging from further education classes, leisure courses, pantomime, concerts, band practice, hall for local school's PE and drama, community events and fund raising events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 11 May 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Adams | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Lesley Foulkes | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janet Dawn Verplancke | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Clive Edward Bareham | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adele Louise Greaves | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jo Ann Matthews | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Bateman | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Brooks | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Porter | Trustee | 12 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rita Marie Holt | Trustee | 13 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Larcombe | Trustee | 13 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.09k | £22.11k | £9.47k | £13.69k | £15.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.33k | £12.38k | £6.78k | £10.79k | £11.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £18.34k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 27TH JULY 1922 as amended on 01 Jul 2024
Charitable objects
PARISH HALL FOR PURPOSES HAVING IN VIEW THE SPIRITUAL, INTELLECTURAL, MORAL OR SOCIAL WANTS OF THE INHABITANTS OF ALL SAINTS, CHARDSTOCK OR NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ALL SAINTS CHARDSTOCK
Contact information
- Address:
-
All Saints & District Village Hall
All Saints
Axminster
Devon
EX13 7LX
- Phone:
- 0129732690
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window