THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE QUEEN VICTORIA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, HERNE BAY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objectives and activities of the League of Friends are to encourage and maintain the interest of the public in the patients and to support the work of the Queen Victoria Memorial Hospital, Herne Bay.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kent
Governance
- 09 October 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GILLIAN FOWLER J P | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Lorraine Baker | Trustee | 10 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jan Woodward | Trustee | 10 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
THERESA CHARLESWORTH | Trustee | 04 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
KATE McGETTRICK | Trustee | 30 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
RAYMOND SIDDERS | Trustee | 16 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANN HEATHER GANNON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS PAT THOMAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN HERMINE ELIZABETH COPPINS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS JACKIE BOWELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID SURRIDGE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SANDRA WINKWORTH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RALPH CARTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN DALE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.67k | £18.72k | £60.98k | £78.79k | £252.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.40k | £37.29k | £49.82k | £112.91k | £35.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 31 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 31 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 June 2023
(These accounts |
20 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 07 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 02 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION OF LEAGUE OF FRIENDS ADOPTED 1949 AND AMENDED 21ST OCTOBER 1987
Charitable objects
TO MOBILISE, ENCOURAGE, FOSTER AND MAINTAIN THE INTEREST OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PATIENTS, THE WELFARE OF THE STAFF, AND THE SUPPORT OF THE WORK OF THE GROUP BY VOLUMTARY SERVICE.
Area of benefit
HERNE BAY
Contact information
- Address:
-
69 MICKLEBURGH AVENUE
HERNE BAY
CT6 6HB
- Phone:
- 01227372935
- Email:
- ray.sidders@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window