THE ROYAL MARINES ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General Charitable Purposes
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 31 December 1963: Standard registration
- 09 November 2020: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 09 November 2020: Funds transferred to 1168387 THE ROYAL MARINES ASSOCIATION LIMITED
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.01m | £973.15k | £739.17k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.07m | £1.09m | £872.66k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £391.95k | £453.12k | £288.97k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £534.63k | £439.74k | £394.82k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £42.47k | £41.48k | £23.43k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £42.93k | £38.82k | £31.95k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £20.00k | £20.09k | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £605.33k | £669.08k | £492.09k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £425.03k | £380.57k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £23.41k | £23.94k | £18.74k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £123.00k | £122.16k | £60.03k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 14 November 2019 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 01 November 2018 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 27 September 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2016
(These accounts |
27 September 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 06/1961 AS AMENDED 09/09/2006 (19TH SERIES) AS AMENDED 18/09/2010 AS AMENDED 24/09/2011 (21ST SERIES)
Charitable objects
TO MAINTAIN AND PROMOTE 'ESPRIT DE CORPS' AND COMRADESHIP AMONGST ALL ROYAL MARINES, TO KEEP THEM IN TOUCH WITH ONE ANOTHER, AND WITH THE ACTIVITIES OF THE SERVING CORPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window