JAMES HAWKEY BANFIELD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
YO PROVIDE A CALENDER, -ú5 AAD A CHRISTMAS CARD TO LOCAL WIDOWS, WIDOWERS AND ORPHANS EACH CHRISTMAS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Cornwall
Governance
- 28 May 1962: Standard registration
- 19 August 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- JOHN HAWKEY BANFIELD CHARITY FOR THE POOR (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30 | £200 | |
|
Total expenditure | £26 | £150 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 30 November 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEMES OF THE 1ST MAY 1917 AND 5TH JUNE 1980
Charitable objects
TO APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHAIRITY FOR THE RELIEF OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF TREGONEY WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS EITHER IN GIFTS IN KIND OR GRANTS OF MONEY.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF TREGONEY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window