GIBSON WALDEN FUND

Charity number: 206023
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Supports the charitable activities of The Gibson Library, The King Edward VI Almshouses, The Saffron Walden Museum and other charities local to Saffron Walden and its people.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £2,814
Total expenditure: £2,400

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Disability
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 October 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • GIBSON SAFFRON WALDEN FUND (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gillian Shirley Williamson Trustee 07 February 2024
The Gibson Library Society
Received: On time
David Kynaston OBE Trustee 23 October 2023
None on record
Martin Stuart Turnbull Trustee 27 July 2017
None on record
Malcolm Dennis White Trustee 27 July 2017
None on record
HOWARD CARL NEWMAN Trustee
The Gibson Library Society
Received: On time
THE NATIONAL BENEVOLENT SOCIETY OF WATCH AND CLOCK MAKERS
Received: On time
ADRIAN JOHN STENTON Trustee
None on record
LUCY CATHERINE BANKS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.64k £2.69k £2.74k £2.80k £2.81k
Total expenditure £2.56k £2.62k £2.65k £2.77k £2.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 31 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 09 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 21 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
GREEN FARM HOUSE
LITTLEBURY GREEN
SAFFRON WALDEN
CB11 4XB
Phone:
01763838600
Website:

No information available