GEORGE PEABODY DONATION FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Peabody's mission is to make London a city of opportunity for all by ensuring as many people as possible have a good home, a real sense of purpose and a strong feeling of belonging. It achieves this through the provision of affordable housing (as a Registered Provider) and community regeneration and personal development activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 01 January 1961: Standard registration
- PEABODY TRUST (Previous name)
- THE PEABODY DONATION FUND (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peabody Trust (Charitable CBS reg. 7741) | Trustee | 29 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £119 | £3.46m | £0 | £100 | £1.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.74k | £14.27k | £10.16k | £9.00k | £14.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £3.46m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £14.27k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
THE PEABODY DONATION FUND ACT 1948 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 18/2/1997 BROUGHT INTO EFFECT BY AN ORDER OF 14/7/1997. AMENDED BY SCHEMES DATED 28/11/2002, 29/7/2005, 24/05/2007, AND BY RESOLUTIONS DATED 18/05/2011, 20 JULY 2011, 26 MARCH 2008, 29 MARCH 2011, 19 NOVEMBER 2014, 28 SEPTEMBER 2016 AND 9 NOVEMBER 2016
Charitable objects
(A) TO RELIEVE THE NEED OF PERSONS IN GREATER LONDON WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION OR OTHERWISE; AND (B) TO PROVIDE RELIEF OUTSIDE GREATER LONDON TO THOSE ELDERLY PERSONS AGED 60 OR OVER WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS AND WHO HAVE A REAL AND SUBSTANTIAL CONNECTION WITH GREATER LONDON BY THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION OR OTHERWISE; AND IN GRANTING RELIEF IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE OBJECTS THE GOVERNORS SHALL ACT IN A NON-SECTARIAN MANNER.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON (30 MILES RADIUS OF THE ROYAL EXCHANGE IN THE CITY OF LONDON).
Contact information
- Address:
-
PEABODY TRUST
MINSTER COURT
45-47 WESTMINSTER BRIDGE ROAD
LONDON
SE1 7JB
- Phone:
- 02041344236
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window