THE BRITISH-GERMAN ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity hopes to achieve creating understanding and forging links between the German and British people. We do 1: Cultural exchange programmes through our Youthbridge Projects in schools. 2: Hold social events, lectures, talks to raise sponsorship for the above.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
41 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 August 1970: Standard registration
- B G A (Working name)
- THE ANGLO-GERMAN ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Barnes | Chair | 11 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Elisabeth Mainelli | Trustee | 13 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Annika Falconer | Trustee | 15 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nick Scherer | Trustee | 15 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Johnston | Trustee | 25 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Thomas Gilchrist | Trustee | 13 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Miriam Thiede | Trustee | 11 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sybille Steiner | Trustee | 11 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Paul Stocker | Trustee | 15 July 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £95.31k | £279.87k | £92.99k | £111.77k | £107.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £81.95k | £71.65k | £109.92k | £132.16k | £135.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.50k | £1.00k | £5.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 November 2020 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25TH MARCH 1958 AS AMENDED 10TH JUNE 1970, 29TH 0CTOBER 1986, 25TH APRIL 1995 AND 14TH NOVEMBER 1995. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 26 MAY 2020
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF CITIZENS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND IN THE SCIENCE, ART, LITERATURE, MUSIC, HISTORY, ECONOMICS, PHILOSOPHY, CULTURE OR OTHER RECOGNISED SUBJECTS OF ACADEMIC STUDY OF GERMANY. (B) TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF CITIZENS OF THE FEDERAL REPUBLIC OF GERMANY IN THE SCIENCE, ART, LITERATURE, MUSIC, HISTORY, ECONOMICS, PHILOSOPHY, CULTURE OR OTHER RECOGNISED SUBJECTS OF ACADEMIC STUDY OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND AT UNIVERSITIES, TECHNICAL SCHOOLS, COLLEGES AND PROFESSIONAL INSTITUTES AND OTHER FOUNDATIONS THEREIN. (C) TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION ABOUT GERMANY AND ITS PEOPLES, HISTORY, LANGUAGE, INSTITUTIONS, CULTURE AND ITS ARTISTIC, INTELLECTUAL AND ECONOMIC LIFE AS AFORESAID.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
34 Belgrave Square
London
SW1X 8QB
- Phone:
- 02072351922
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window