Accounts and annual returns SOUTHGATE VILLAGE HALL AND MISSION ROOM

Charity number: 206081
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2015 17 June 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2014 18 June 2015 138 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2013 02 August 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not Required