SUFFOLK NATURALISTS' SOCIETY

Charity number: 206084
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Society promotes the study, recording and publishing of information concerning the wildlife of Suffolk, along with its geology and geomorphology. Each year the Society publishes two journals in addition to a newsletter. Its wildlife recorders regularly provide information to other similar organisations and conservation bodies within the county.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £26,643
Total expenditure: £26,209

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Suffolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 October 1988: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • SNS (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOAN FRANCES HARDINGHAM Chair
SUFFOLK WILDLIFE TRUST
Received: On time
Dr Simon Jackson Trustee 26 April 2023
None on record
Emma Aldous Trustee 26 April 2023
None on record
Hawk Honey Trustee 26 April 2023
None on record
Matthew John Deans Trustee 25 November 2020
None on record
Dorothy Casey Trustee 10 April 2019
FALCON MEADOW COMMUNITY TRUST
Received: On time
Darren Charles Tansley Trustee 10 April 2019
None on record
Peter John Vincent Trustee 11 April 2018
Middleton-cum-Fordley Community Council
Received: On time
Juliet Katherine Hawkins Trustee 12 April 2017
None on record
Howard Barnaby Mottram Trustee 14 April 2015
None on record
Genevieve Broad Trustee 10 April 2010
None on record
MARTIN NICHOLAS SANFORD Trustee
None on record
MR NICK MASON Trustee
Suffolk Bird Group
Received: On time
COLIN JOHN HAWES Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £32.69k £28.39k £25.15k £39.58k £26.64k
Total expenditure £33.61k £40.21k £22.84k £26.62k £26.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 11 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 11 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 23 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 23 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 26 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 29 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 26 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
WILL PROVED ON 17/04/1958 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 29/07/1988 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 19/09/2013
Charitable objects
THE GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF THE CHARITY CALLED SUFFOLK NATURALISTS SOCIETY IN THE COUNTY OF SUFFOLK.
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF SUFFOLK
Registration history
  • 06 October 1988 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
131 Fore Street
IPSWICH
IP4 1LR
Phone:
07930 908746