BESTHORPE POOR'S LAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grants in cash or kind to help Besthorpe villagers who have fallen on hard times.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Norfolk
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
- BESTHORPE POORS TRUST (Working name)
- THE BESTHORPE TRUST (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tony Bradstreet | Chair |
|
||||||||
Darren Peck | Trustee | 18 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||
David Dore | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||||
MARCIA SOLLOWAY-BROWN | Trustee | 22 January 2013 |
|
|
||||||
Rev MATTHEW CHRISTOPHER JACKSON | Trustee | 28 May 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £850 | £850 | £851 | £877 | £1.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £500 | £0 | £2.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 October 2024 | 253 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 23RD APRIL 1875 AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF 11TH DECEMBER 1986
Charitable objects
GENERAL BENEFIT OF POOR PERSONS IN THE PARISH OF BESTHORPE.
Area of benefit
BESTHORPE PARISH
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 BICKLEY CLOSE
ATTLEBOROUGH
NR17 2NT
- Phone:
- 01953 453915
- Email:
- besthorpe@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window