LEATHER AND HIDE TRADES' BENEVOLENT INSTITUTION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
LHTBI provides financial assistance to persons who are or have been, employed in the leather industry and who are aged or incapacitated from earning a livelihood. Bereaved spouses are also eligible to apply. Typically applicants should have spent a minimum of ten years service in the leather industry.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
- LHTBI (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR J W TUSTING | Chair | 12 March 1991 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Aiers | Trustee | 22 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
SIMON YARWOOD | Trustee | 15 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard Brown | Trustee | 24 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
JAMES BOSTON | Trustee | 07 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
PETER CRACK | Trustee | 05 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr MARK WILKINSON | Trustee | 15 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
IAN MICHEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARTIN PEBODY | Trustee |
|
||||||
JONATHAN FREESTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.23k | £35.46k | £38.31k | £46.75k | £41.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £87.22k | £88.68k | £88.35k | £85.54k | £80.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 04 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 15TH FEBRUARY 1982 AS AMENDED 21ST FEBRUARY 1989
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE INSTITUTION SHALL BE THE RELIEF OF NECESSITOUSE PERSONS WHO ARE ENGAGED IN THE LEATHER INDUSTRY WHO ARE AGED OR INCAPACITATED FROM EARNING A LIVELIHOOD, AND THE BEREAVED SPOUSE, ADULT DEPENDANTS AND ORPHANS OF ANY SUCH PERSON.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Lyncroft Leys
Scraptoft
LEICESTER
LE7 9UW
- Phone:
- 07710921566
- Email:
- lhtbisecretary@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window