THE FUEL ALLOTMENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is for the benefit of the parishioners of Hardingham. It gives fuel grants to the elderly and infirm. Grants for help in sickness and disability. Grants towards bereavement costs. Education and facilities for the young and elderly are considered. The trustees welcome referrals of potential beneficiaries from any source. The charity supports the most needy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Norfolk
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HENRY EDWARDS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr Alasdair Robert Duthie | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Dr Tim Weatherstone | Trustee | 24 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL GIBB | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.31k | £16.06k | £17.09k | £18.12k | £18.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.70k | £15.83k | £11.15k | £10.40k | £11.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 May 2024 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 8TH NOVEMBER 1966 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 14 FEB 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN HARDINGHAM WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS. THE CHARITY MAY MAKE GRANTS TO ANY OTHER CHARITY WHICH HAS THE SAME OBJECTIVES OF RELIEF OF POVERTY, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS WHOSE RESIDENTS RESIDE WITHIN THE SAME ECCLESIASTICAL BENEFICE AS HARDINGHAM.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF HARDINGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
DENMARK HOUSE
NORWICH ROAD
HARDINGHAM
NORWICH
NR9 4EG
- Phone:
- 01953850606
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window