RESTHAVEN ALMSHOUSES

Charity number: 206182
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of housing

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £34,240
Total expenditure: £28,164

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 September 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Homes England
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mary Barbara Smith Chair 20 May 2010
ASH UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
FRANK KINGSLAND'S TRUST FOR THE ELDERLY
Received: On time
John Stephen Tanner Trustee 01 March 2022
ASH UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
FRANK KINGSLAND'S TRUST FOR THE ELDERLY
Received: On time
Maureen Bubb Trustee 07 October 2020
FRANK KINGSLAND'S TRUST FOR THE ELDERLY
Received: On time
ASH UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
Carole Palmer Trustee 17 April 2017
ASH UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
FRANK KINGSLAND'S TRUST FOR THE ELDERLY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £131.23k £30.83k £32.87k £31.08k £34.24k
Total expenditure £16.90k £8.96k £7.20k £30.96k £28.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 02 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 02 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 29 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 29 September 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 17 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 17 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 21 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 07 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 07 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
2 Chequer Lane
Ash
Canterbury
CT3 2ET
Phone:
07876597988
Website:

No information available