Guilsborough Village Hall

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of building consisting of three rooms for use by community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 07 April 1962: Standard registration
- GUILSBOROUGH VILLAGE HALL MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE (Working name)
- READING ROOM (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Mary O'Neil | Chair | 04 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elizabeth Needham | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Allison Teresa Jean Phillips | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Peter O'Neil | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Michael Hart | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.97k | £28.64k | £18.11k | £31.02k | £16.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.84k | £2.94k | £13.98k | £52.26k | £25.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £27.91k | £4.17k | £10.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CHARITY COMMISSION SCHEME 3 AUGUST, 1927. VARIED 26TH MARCH 1964. as amended on 21 Mar 2022 as amended on 21 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
USE BY PARISHIONERS AS (1) READING ROOM, LIBRARY OR CLUB.(2) MEETINGS OF LOCAL ASSOCIATIONS.(3) LECTURES, ENTERTAINMENTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF GUILSBOROUGH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Guilsborough Village Hall
The Green
Guilsborough
Guilsborough
NN6 8PT
- Phone:
- 07342382706
- Email:
- info@guilsboroughvh.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window